Mann, Miriam Elizabeth Siess (CPSO#: 59482)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 May 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 272-8210 Ext. 2452
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Miriam Mann Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mann ( CPSO# 59482 )

Business Address:
Stratford General Hospital
Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIRIAM ELIZABETH SIESS MANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 1990