Mann, Neel (CPSO#: 83821)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Taskent Medical Institute, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Sep 2008
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006