Mann, Ranbir Singh (CPSO#: 58082)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 15 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2009
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 2013