Mannerfeldt, Jaelene Marie (CPSO#: 71928)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 04 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAELENE MARIE MANNERFELDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANNERFELDT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 1997 to 14 Nov 1997
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Nov 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1998