Manning, Alan Jeffrey (CPSO#: 59386)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Paul Family Health Network
St. Joseph's Lifecare Centre 4th Fl
99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
Brantford ON  N3S 6T6
Phone: (519) 756-6400
Fax: (519) 756-7343
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alan Jeffrey Manning Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Manning ( CPSO# 59386 )

Business Address:
99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
4th Floor
Brantford ON  N3S 6T6
Phone Number: (519) 756-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN JEFFREY MANNING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANNING is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1989