Manoharan, Sathiyapooma (CPSO#: 77259)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Dec 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6065 Steeles Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1X 0A8
Phone: (416) 754-0003
Fax: (416) 754-0005
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manoharan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Manoharan ( CPSO# 77259 )

Business Address:
E3, E6 - 6065 Steeles Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1X 0A8
Phone Number: (416) 754-0003

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SATHIYAPOOMA MANOHARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANOHARAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 07 Jan 2002 to 06 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 07 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 May 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2004