Manolopoulos, Vaselios (CPSO#: 68365)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
33 City Centre Drive, Ste 420
Mississauga ON  L5B 2N5
Phone: (905) 608-1444
Fax: (905) 828-5136
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vaselios Manolopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Manolopoulos ( CPSO# 68365 )

Business Address:
420B - 33 City Centre Drive
Mississauga ON  L5B 2N5
Phone Number: (905) 608-1444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VASELIOS MANOLOPOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANOLOPOULOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2001