Manowski, Zbigniew Jerzy (CPSO#: 55313)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital,
Department of Laboratory Medicine,
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100 Ext. 2341
Fax: (905) 848-8313
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Health Centre
Laboratory Medicine
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Canada
Phone: (416) 259-7580 Ext. 5344
Fax: (416) 521-4173
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

LifeLabs
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Canada
Phone: (416) 675-4530 Ext. 2811
Fax: (416) 213-4206
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Z. Manowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Manowski ( CPSO# 55313 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Department of Laboratory Medicine
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Business Address:
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Phone Number: (416) 675-4530

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 01 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZBIGNIEW JERZY MANOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1990