Manseau, Danielle Isabelle Marie (CPSO#: 44059)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Dec 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C L S C Aylmer
425 Le Guerrier
Gatineau QC  J9H 6N8
Phone: (819) 966-6548
Fax: (819) 966-6542
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gray O'Byrne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. O'Byrne ( CPSO# 31480 )
Dr. D. Manseau ( CPSO# 44059 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
260 Dalhousie Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 7E4
Phone Number: (613) 241-7400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELLE ISABELLE MARIE MANSEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANSEAU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1990