Mansell, Graham Lee (CPSO#: 75713)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Sep 2000 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 21 Nov 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 2003