Mansfield, Perry Thomas (CPSO#: 58064)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 03 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 2005