Manson, Heather Elizabeth (CPSO#: 51162)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Public Health Ontario
480 University Avenue
Suite 300
Toronto ON  M5G 1V2
Phone: (647) 260-7301
Fax: (647) 260-7600
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER ELIZABETH MANSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Research Fellows - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1987