Manson, Nadine Elizabeth Fletcher (CPSO#: 64181)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
60 Gillingham Dr.
Brampton ON  L6Z 0Z9
Phone: (905) 451-1937
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Doctor's Breastfeeding Clinic
10 Gillingham Dr
Ste 201A
Brampton ON  L6Z 0X9
Canada
Phone: (289) 233-1957
Fax: 905-230-8700
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nadine Manson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Manson ( CPSO# 64181 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 431-2120

Business Address:
Suite 201A
10 Gillingham Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 0G6

Business Address:
Suite 200
60 Gillingham Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 0Z9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jul 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADINE ELIZABETH FLETCHER MANSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Jan 1993
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Feb 1993 to 31 Jan 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993