Manson, Peter (CPSO#: 51163)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 08 Mar 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Manson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 17 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 25 Mar 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Mar 2016