Mansour, Emad Husni Tawfiq (CPSO#: 74442)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 21 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 15 Oct 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2004 to 31 Mar 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2005