Mansour, Maged Mansour Assad (CPSO#: 88847)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Bernstein Diet & Health Clinics
21 Kern Road
Toronto ON  M3B 1S9
Phone: 416-447-3438 Ext. 241
Fax: 416-447-4185
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Biochemistry Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAGED MANSOUR ASSAD MANSOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANSOUR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Biochemistry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013