Mansour, Marlene (CPSO#: 96063)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARLENE MANSOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANSOUR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 21 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2016