Mansukhani, Tarun Ram (CPSO#: 92669)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Jul 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Grace University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2361 Warden Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1T 1V7
Phone: (416) 299-4999
Fax: (416) 299-1322
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

549 Bur Oak Avenue
Markham ON  L6C 3E5
Canada
Phone: (905) 554-0199
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Mansukhani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Mansukhani ( CPSO# 92669 )

Business Address:
2361 Warden Avenue
Toronto ON  M1T 1V7
Phone Number: (416) 299-4999

Business Address:
549 Bur Oak Avenue
Markham ON  L6C 3E5
Phone Number: (905) 554-0199

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 May 2015 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 20 Apr 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 26 Jan 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Tarun  Ram  Mansukhani  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  family
            medicine.