Mansworth, Maurice Colman (CPSO#: 26916)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gaelic

Education:National University of Ireland, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
309 Park Street
Suite 203
Brockville ON  K6V 6E5
Phone: (613) 345-0918
Fax: (613) 345-0865
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maurice Colman Mansworth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mansworth ( CPSO# 26916 )

Business Address:
203 - 309 Park Street
Brockville ON  K6V 6E5
Phone Number: (613) 345-0918

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 02 Aug 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 02 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from August 2, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Maurice Colman
            Mansworth in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Mansworth
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                     DR. MAURICE COLEMAN MANSWORTH
                                           ("Dr. Mansworth")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
                  "Narcotic Drugs" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                  the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended.
                  
                  "Narcotic Preparations" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                  under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as
                  amended.
                  
                  "Controlled Drugs" means from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
                  under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27, as amended.
                  
                  "Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances" means from the
                  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the
                  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended 
                  
                        (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
                        as Schedule "A"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
                        hereto as Schedule "B")
                  
                  "All other Monitored Drugs" means as defined under the Narcotics Safety
                  and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended, as noted in
                  Schedule "C".                                          
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Mansworth, certificate of registration number 26916, am a member
                  of the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Mansworth, acknowledge that the College received information from
                  the NMS and initiated an investigation bearing File Number 7215172 (the
                  "Investigation") into whether I failed to maintain the standard of
                  practice of the profession and/or am incompetent in my prescribing of
                  controlled substances, including narcotics. 

            (4)   I, Dr. Mansworth, acknowledge that, if an original copy of this
                  Undertaking as signed by me is accepted by the Inquiries, Complaints and
                  Reports Committee, the College will also deliver a caution in person.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Mansworth, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the
                  ICR Committee ("Effective Date").

            (6)   I, Dr. Mansworth, shall keep a log of all prescriptions for Narcotic
                  Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                  Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the form attached
                  as set out in Schedule "D", which will include at least the following
                  information (the "Prescribing Log"):  

                  (i)   the date of the appointment;
                  
                  (ii)  the name of the patient and chart/file number;
                  
                  (iii) the name of the medication prescribed, dose, direction, number of
                        tablets to be dispensed and frequency;
                  
                  (iv)  the clinical indication;
                  
                  (v)   whether the prescription is for a new medication and/or different
                        dose or frequency than currently prescribed to the patient (Y/N); 
                  
                  (vi)  Dr. Mansworth's signature;
                  
                  (vii) the date of the Clinical Supervisor's review (if applicable, as set
                        out below); and
                  
                  (viii)the Clinical Supervisor's signature (if applicable, as set out
                        below).
                  
            (7)   I, Dr. Mansworth, undertake to keep a copy of all prescriptions I write
                  for Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored
                  Drugs, in the corresponding patient chart.

            (8)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mansworth, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for a minimum of twelve (12) months on the terms
                        set out below (the "Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Mansworth, acknowledge and undertake that each phase of
                        Clinical Supervision set out below will only be reduced upon
                        recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval by the
                        College.
                  
            Phase 1 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 1")

                  (c)   I, Dr. Mansworth, undertake to engage in Phase 1 of Clinical
                        Supervision for a minimum of two (2) months on the terms set out
                        below.
                  
                  (d)   During Phase 1, I, Dr. Mansworth, undertake to meet with my
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) at least once every week to discuss the
                        Clinical Supervisor(s)'s review of:
                  
                        i.    20 charts for patients to whom I have prescribed Narcotic
                              Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                              Monitored Drugs since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                              review, or if there are not 20 patients listed in the
                              Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                              review, then the charts of all patients listed in the
                              Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor's prior review;
                              and
                  
                        ii.   the chart of every patient to whom I have initiated a new
                              prescription for Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations,
                              Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                              Substances and/or All other Monitored Drugs since the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Mansworth, acknowledge that during Phase 1, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) must sign and date the Prescribing Log to confirm the
                        charts that the Clinical Supervisor(s) have reviewed and discussed
                        with me.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Mansworth, acknowledge that during Phase 1, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College at least once
                        every two weeks.
                  (g)   I, Dr. Mansworth, acknowledge that after a minimum of two (2)
                        months of Phase 1, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that
                        I have the necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to practice in
                        a less highly supervised environment, the Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may recommend to the College that supervision be reduced. 
                  
            Phase 2 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 2")

                  (h)   Upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval
                        by the College, I, Dr. Mansworth, undertake to engage in Phase 2 of
                        Clinical Supervision for a minimum of four (4) months on the terms
                        set out below.
                  
                  (i)   During Phase 2, I, Dr. Mansworth, undertake to meet with my
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) at least bi-weekly to discuss the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s review of:
                  
                        i.    15 charts for patients to whom I have prescribed Narcotic
                              Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                              Monitored Drugs since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                              review, or if there are not 15 patients listed in the
                              Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                              review, then the charts of all patients listed in the
                              Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor's prior review;
                              and
                  
                        ii.   the chart of every patient to whom I have initiated a new
                              prescription for Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations,
                              Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                              Substances and/or All other Monitored Drugs since the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review. 
                  
                  (j)   I, Dr. Mansworth, acknowledge that during Phase 2, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) must sign and date the Prescribing Log to confirm the
                        charts that the Clinical Supervisor(s) have reviewed and discussed
                        with me.
                  
                  (k)   I, Dr. Mansworth, acknowledge that during Phase 2, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College at least once
                        bi-weekly.
                  
                  (l)   I, Dr. Mansworth, acknowledge that after a minimum of four (4)
                        months of Phase 2, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that
                        I have the necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to practice in
                        a less highly supervised environment, the Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may recommend to the College that supervision be reduced. 
                  
            Phase 3 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 3")

                  (m)   Upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval
                        by the College, I, Dr. Mansworth, undertake to engage in Phase 3 of
                        Clinical Supervision for a minimum of six (6) months on the terms
                        set out below.
                  
                  (n)   During Phase 3, I, Dr. Mansworth, undertake to meet with my
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) at least once every month to discuss the
                        Clinical Supervisor(s)'s review of:
                  
                        i.    15 charts for patients to whom I have prescribed Narcotic
                              Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                              Monitored Drugs since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                              review, or if there are not 15 patients listed in the
                              Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                              review, then the charts of all patients listed in the
                              Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor's prior review;
                              and
                  
                        ii.   the chart of every patient to whom I have initiated a new
                              prescription for Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations,
                              Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                              Substances and/or All other Monitored Drugs since the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review. 
                  
                  (o)   I, Dr. Mansworth, acknowledge that during Phase 3, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) must sign and date the Prescribing Log to confirm the
                        charts that the Clinical Supervisor(s) have reviewed and discussed
                        with me.
                  
                  (p)   I, Dr. Mansworth, acknowledge that during Phase 3, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College at least once
                        every month.
                  
                  (q)   I, Dr. Mansworth, acknowledge that after a minimum of six (6)
                        months of Phase 2, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that
                        I have the necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to practice
                        without supervision, the Clinical Supervisor(s) may recommend to
                        the College that the Clinical Supervision cease.
                  
                  (r)   I, Dr. Mansworth, acknowledge and undertake that the Clinical
                        Supervision will only cease upon recommendation of the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) and approval by the College.
                  
                  (s)   I, Dr. Mansworth, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Schedule "E", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s).  In
                        addition to what is set out above, the Clinical Supervisor(s) will,
                        at a minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Schedule
                              "F";
                  
                        (ii)  Discuss any concerns with me arising from chart reviews and
                              observations;
                  
                        (iii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; and
                  
                        (iv)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision.
                  
                  (t)   I, Dr. Mansworth, undertake that all meetings with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will take place at my Practice Location, or another
                        location approved by the College;
                  
                  (u)   I, Dr. Mansworth, acknowledge that all charts reviewed shall be
                        independently selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the
                        educational needs identified in the IEP set out at Schedule "F" to
                        my Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                        report of the medical inspector dated March 26 2017, and concerns
                        that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (v)   I, Dr. Mansworth, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the terms of this
                        Undertaking and Schedule "E" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (w)   I, Dr. Mansworth, undertake to ensure that Schedule "E" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within fourteen
                        (14) days of the Effective Date.
                  
                  (x)   I, Dr. Mansworth, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Schedule "E" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        fourteen (14) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (y)   I, Dr. Mansworth, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the terms set out in sections (7)(w) and/or (x)
                        above, I will cease prescribing Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
                        Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                        Substances and All other Monitored Drugs until such time as I have
                        obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (z)   I, Dr. Mansworth, agree that if I am required to cease prescribing
                        Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                        Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                        Monitored Drugs as a result of section (7)(y) above this will
                        constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of
                        registration and that term, condition or limitation will be
                        included on the Public Register.
                  
                  
            (9)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mansworth, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all elements of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Schedule "F", including but not limited to, the following elements
                        of professional education (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine program in Safe
                              Opioid Prescribing (all three webinars and in-person
                              workshop): www.cepd.utoronto.ca/opioidprescribing;
                  
                        (ii)  Review and discuss with my Clinical Supervisor(s) the
                              following resources:
                  
                              1.    CPSO Policy "Prescribing Drugs":
                                    
                                    http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Prescribing-
                                    Drugs;
                  
                              2.    the Canadian Guideline for the Safe and Effective Use
                                    of Opioids for Chronic Non-Cancer Pain:
                                     http://nationalpaincentre.mcmaster.ca/opioid;
                  
                              3.    CMPA advice regarding preventing the misuse of opioids
                                    https://www.cmpa-acpm.ca/en/advice-publications/browse-articles/2015/preventing-the-misuse-of-opioids
                  
                                    (iii) any additional professional education recommended
                                          by my Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Mansworth, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of each element of the Professional Education
                        specified above, including proof of registration, attendance and
                        participant assessment reports where available, within one (1)
                        month of completion of each element. I acknowledge that the College
                        will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully
                        completed each element of the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Mansworth, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
            (10)  Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mansworth, undertake that, approximately six (6) months
                        after the Clinical Supervision set out under section 7 of the
                        Undertaking has ceased, I will submit to a reassessment of my
                        practice by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the
                        "Reassessment").
                  
                   (b)  I, Dr. Mansworth, acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may
                        include a chart review, direct observation of my care, an interview
                        of me, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Mansworth, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the terms of this Undertaking 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Mansworth, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) may receive and review the findings of the
                        Assessor(s), and may discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or
                        concerns arising from the Reassessment.  
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Mansworth, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and that the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
            (11)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mansworth, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within ten
                        (10) business days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within ten (10) business days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Mansworth, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and
                        not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice
                        Location(s) and patient records by a College representative for the
                        purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Mansworth, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                        make appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics
                        Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010 and/or any person or institution who may
                        have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                        compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Mansworth, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Schedule "G" and Schedule "H",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Mansworth, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Mansworth, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Mansworth, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (15)  I, Dr. Mansworth, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (16)  I, Dr. Mansworth, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (17)  I, Dr. Mansworth, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (18)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mansworth, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Mansworth, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with the section above, the following
                        summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
                        period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              The College received information from the Narcotics
                              Monitoring System about Dr. Mansworth's prescribing of
                              controlled substances, including narcotics.
                  
                              Based on the information received, the College conducted an
                              investigation into whether Dr. Mansworth failed to maintain
                              the standard of practice of the profession and/or was
                              incompetent in his prescribing of controlled substances,
                              including narcotics.  As a result of the investigation:
                  
                              "Dr. Mansworth's prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic
                              preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other
                              targeted substances, and other monitored drugs will be
                              supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College
                              for a minimum of twelve (12) months. 
                  
                              "Dr. Mansworth will engage in professional education in the
                              prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.
                              "Following the professional education and period of
                              supervision, Dr. Mansworth's prescribing of controlled
                              substances, including narcotics, will be re-assessed by an
                              assessor selected by the College.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (19)  I, Dr. Mansworth, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to any person who requires this information for
                  the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (20)  I, Dr. Mansworth, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
                  the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (21)  I, Dr. Mansworth, give my irrevocable consent to any person who
                  facilitates my completion of the Professional Education, and to all
                  Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the
                  College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Schedule "E";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which he or she reasonably believes
                        indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 2, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Maurice Colman Mansworth to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 2, 2017:

The College received information from the Narcotics Monitoring System about Dr. Mansworth’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Based on the information received, the College conducted an investigation into whether Dr. Mansworth failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Mansworth’s prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances, and other monitored drugs will be supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of twelve (12) months.

Dr. Mansworth will engage in professional education in the prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Following the professional education and period of supervision, Dr. Mansworth’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics, will be re-assessed by an assessor selected by the College.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 2, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)