Mantle, Edward Ross (CPSO#: 62539)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cairns Hospital
165/171 Esplanade
Cairns 4870
Australia
Phone: +61742260000
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edward Mantle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 10 2013

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 May 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD ROSS MANTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANTLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1991