Mantle, Nancy Gail (CPSO#: 65152)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Forensic Psychiatry Effective: 31 Jul 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Nov 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Dec 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Nov 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015