Mantle, Ross Edward (CPSO#: 70579)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone: (705) 522-0292
Fax: (705) 522-9933
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ross Mantle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mantle ( CPSO# 70579 )

Business Address:
201 - 2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone Number: (705) 522-0292

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSS EDWARD MANTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANTLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2005