Mantle, Valerie Ingrid (CPSO#: 71516)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: Gunther, Valerie Ingrid (used until: 12 Jan 2000 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1
2120 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone: (705) 671-3011
Fax: (705) 671-2335
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Valerie Mantle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Mantle ( CPSO# 71516 )

Business Address:
Suite 1
2120 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone Number: (705) 671-3011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VALERIE INGRID MANTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANTLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1999