Mantro, Kiran Bala (CPSO#: 51164)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 May 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjabi University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3850 Finch Avenue East
Suite 312
Scarborough ON  M1T 3T6
Phone: (416) 298-6342
Fax: (416) 298-6342
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 26 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIRAN BALA MANTRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANTRO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1985