Manuel, Douglas Geoffrey (CPSO#: 66203)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Feb 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Research Institute
725 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19108
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

219 Argyle Ave.
Ottawa ON  K2P 2H4
Canada
Phone: (613) 232-9634 Ext. 412
Fax: (613) 288-0909
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

117 Ossington Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 3B7
Canada
Phone: (613) 730-8445
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas Manuel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 02 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Manuel ( CPSO# 66203 )

Business Address:
219 Argyle Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2P 2H4

Business Address:
117 Ossington Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 3B7
Phone Number: (613) 730-8445

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS GEOFFREY MANUEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANUEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 1993