Manuel, Mogamat Arifie (CPSO#: 27255)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 12 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Arifie Manuel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 24 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 250 Harding Boulevard West Richmond Hill ON L4C 9M7
Date Received: 12 Jun 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2017