Manwell, Stuart Ernest Eric (CPSO#: 72304)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 5110
Grey Bruce Health Services
Corporation - Owen Sound
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2023
Fax: (519) 376-1145
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stuart Manwell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Manwell ( CPSO# 72304 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
Suite 5110
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2023

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STUART ERNEST ERIC MANWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANWELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003