Mar, Colin Randall (CPSO#: 73246)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 24 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 04 Feb 1999 to 03 Mar 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Mar 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008