Mar, Warren Jeffrey (CPSO#: 66941)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Dec 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Oshawa Medical Centre
Suite 201
1400 Ritson Road North
Oshawa ON  L1G 7W4
Phone: (905) 433-1895
Fax: (905) 433-0962
Electoral District: 05

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WARREN JEFFREY MAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1995