Maraj, Ramsarran (CPSO#: 28810)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Oct 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 1976

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bristol, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
#103-210 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5G8
Phone: (613) 962-5966
Fax: (613) 962-5230
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ramsarran Maraj Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Maraj ( CPSO# 28810 )

Business Address:
Suite 103
210 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5G8
Phone Number: (613) 962-5966

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMSARRAN MARAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARAJ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1976

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: November 12, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP.
Download Full Document (PDF)