Marani, Farah (CPSO#: 108621)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 13 May 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 2017 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Mar 2016 to 26 Mar 2016
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Toronto, 27 Mar 2016 to 08 Apr 2016
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 09 May 2016 to 13 May 2016
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Apr 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 May 2016