Marans, Howard John (CPSO#: 51031)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 306 11190 Warner Avenue Fountain Valley, California 92708 United States
Date Received: 28 Apr 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Research Fellows - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014