Marazzi, Alex Sandro (CPSO#: 61193)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jul 2005