Marcarian, Berge (CPSO#: 60790)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2020 Brimley Road
Scarborough ON  M1S 4R7
Phone: (416) 293-5511
Fax: (416) 293-5077
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Berge Marcarian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Marcarian ( CPSO# 60790 )

Business Address:
Suite 209
4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 293-5511

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 08 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BERGE MARCARIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCARIAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1990