Marcassa, David Allen (CPSO#: 58574)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Frontenac Medical Associates
791 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1E9
Phone: 613-544-2727
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Allan Marcassa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Marcassa ( CPSO# 58574 )

Business Address:
Frontenac Medical Associates
Suite 201
791 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1E9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2727

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ALLEN MARCASSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCASSA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1988