Marceau-Cote, Thomas (CPSO#: 107461)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Apr 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2016