Marcellus, Deborah Caryn (CPSO#: 53094)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 575-9827
Fax: (905) 575-6340
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.C. Marcellus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Marcellus ( CPSO# 53094 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 575-9827

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 23 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH CARYN MARCELLUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCELLUS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 31 May 1982 to 11 Jun 1982
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1988