March, Gerard Michael John (CPSO#: 88200)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 204
429 Exmouth Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 5P1
Phone: (519) 336-7860
Fax: (519) 336-0020
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gerard M.J. March Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. March ( CPSO# 88200 )

Business Address:
Unit 204
429 Exmouth Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 5P1
Phone Number: (519) 336-7860

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERARD MICHAEL JOHN MARCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2008 to 01 Jun 2008
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2009