March, Roderick Joseph (CPSO#: 55601)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Nov 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1994