Marchand, Eve-Lyne (CPSO#: 87341)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Montreal, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 25 Aug 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 25 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Oct 2013
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2013