Marchant, Rosemary Elizabeth (CPSO#: 45635)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Prince Edward Island

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Occupational Medicine Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Apr 2017