Marchetti, Paul Joseph (CPSO#: 62369)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6990 Derry Road
Suite 202
Milton ON  L9T 7H3
Phone: (905) 878-4556
Fax: (905) 878-4296
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Michael's Hospital
M S Clinic
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: (416) 864-5377
Fax: (416) 864-5378
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Marchetti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Marchetti ( CPSO# 62369 )

Business Address:
202 - 6990 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 21 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL JOSEPH MARCHETTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCHETTI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1991