Marchuk, Jon Blair (CPSO#: 26419)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 05 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2009
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010