Marcilio, Milton Portela (CPSO#: 32388)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Dec 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:University of Bahia, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Dec 2016