Marck, Paul Albert (CPSO#: 55563)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 07 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 1999