Marcon, Norman Emilio (CPSO#: 19374)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Oct 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:Queen's University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
16-062 Victoria Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-3092
Fax: (416) 864-5993
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 07 Apr 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NORMAN EMILIO MARCON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1962
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1963
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Apr 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1971