Marcotte, Francois (CPSO#: 61445)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Oct 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mayo Clinic Arizona
Cardiovascular Diseases
13400 East Shea Blvd
Scottsdale AZ  85259
United States
Phone: (480) 301-4469
Fax: (480) 301-8018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec
USA - Arizona
USA - Vermont

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 29 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCOIS MARCOTTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCOTTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 12 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Sep 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2001