Marcotte, Laura Susanne (CPSO#: 84553)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medicine
Etherington Hall, Room 1018
94 Stuart Street
Queen's University
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-2780
Fax: (613) 533-6654
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L.S. Marcotte Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Marcotte ( CPSO# 84553 )

Business Address:
Queen's University Department of Medicine
Etherington Hall Room 1018
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2780

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA SUSANNE MARCOTTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCOTTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 01 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 02 Jun 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011