Marcucci, Maura (CPSO#: 100752)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  24 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Perugia, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Health Sciences Centre
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 525-9140
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 05 Jun 2013 to 28 Aug 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 29 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Aug 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Maura Marcucci may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of General Internal Medicine and the Department of Health
                        Research Methods,  Evidence,  and  Impact,  McMaster University, in
                        which Dr. Marcucci holds an academic appointment  at  the  rank  of
                        Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or  when  Dr.  Marcucci no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives  a  report  indicating that  Dr.  Marcucci's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does not receive an annual  report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when  the  Committee   makes   a   decision  about  Dr.  Marcucci's
                        certificate  of  registration,  following   consideration   of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate is issued on July 1, 2017, and currently has an interim
                  expiry  date of August 24, 2018.  The expiry date of this certificate may
                  be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.