Marcuzzi, Danny William Jimmy (CPSO#: 54207)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5681
Fax: (416) 864-5380
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Common Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Deva ( CPSO# 93514 )
Dr. G. Mnatzakanian ( CPSO# 88831 )
Dr. J. Barfett ( CPSO# 84352 )
Dr. A. Zalev ( CPSO# 24495 )
Dr. D. Sarma ( CPSO# 76653 )
Dr. V. Prabhudesai ( CPSO# 81446 )
Dr. D. Pearce ( CPSO# 65503 )
Dr. L. Noel De Tilly ( CPSO# 62846 )
Dr. D. Muradali ( CPSO# 59826 )
Dr. W. Montanera ( CPSO# 31960 )
Dr. T. Marotta ( CPSO# 53911 )
Dr. D. Marcuzzi ( CPSO# 54207 )
Dr. W. Mak ( CPSO# 85186 )
Dr. A. Kirpalani ( CPSO# 74950 )
Dr. B. Gray ( CPSO# 58202 )
Dr. F. Goldberg ( CPSO# 50752 )
Dr. T. Dowdell ( CPSO# 55456 )
Dr. A. Bharatha ( CPSO# 79389 )
Dr. E. Colak ( CPSO# 79512 )
Dr. A. Common ( CPSO# 59024 )
Dr. P. Vlachou ( CPSO# 90004 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5680


Corporation Name: Dr. D.W. Marcuzzi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Marcuzzi ( CPSO# 54207 )

Business Address:
St. Michaels Hospital
3CC - 30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5692

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANNY WILLIAM JIMMY MARCUZZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCUZZI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Diagnostic and Therapeutic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1986